CA SB326 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 279, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 279, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 626.81 of the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders.
Title
Sex offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-26 - Assembly - SB 326 Beall Senate Third Reading By FONG (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB326 Beall (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB326 Beall (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 279, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:15 p.m. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. (Corrected August 28.) |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2710.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 13). |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1174.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1011.) (May 23). |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 756.) (April 30). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 591.) (April 17). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 626.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |