CA SB326 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 764, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 764, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1357.51, 1357.503, 1357.512, 1367.005, 1399.849, and 1399.855 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10112.27, 10198.7, 10753.05, 10753.14, 10965.3, and 10965.9 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: federal health care reforms.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB326 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Assembly - SB 326 Pan Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB326 Pan et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Assembly - SB 326 Pan Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB326 Pan et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 764, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2521.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2815.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1034.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 457.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1357.503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1357.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1357.512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1399.849 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1399.855 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10198.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10753.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10753.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10965.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10965.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |