CA SB33 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 480, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 480, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1281.2 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to arbitration.
Title
Arbitration agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB33 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 33 Dodd Senate Third Reading By DABABNEH (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB33 Dodd et al (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 33 Dodd Senate Third Reading By DABABNEH (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB33 Dodd et al (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 480, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2524.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 23. Page 2955.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 27). |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1254.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Published May 16 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 945.) (May 2). |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1281.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1624.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |