CA SB342 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17525 and 17526 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Misleading advertising: domain and subdomain names.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB342 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - Assembly - SB 342 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB342 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - Assembly - SB 342 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB342 Hertzberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4349.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5200.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | July 2 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1201.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1097.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 906.) (April 30). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 17526 | Amended Code | Citation Text |