CA SB344 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 642, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 642, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42018, 42101.5, 42103, and 42111 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to prepaid mobile telephony services.
Title
Local Prepaid Mobile Telephony Services Collection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - 09/12/19 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB344 McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 344 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Burke (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB344 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB344 McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 344 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Burke (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB344 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 642, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2937.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2963.) |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Set for hearing September 12. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2808.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 3335.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | June 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1003.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 846.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 42018 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 42101.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 42103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 42111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |