CA SB369 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 275, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 275, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 3.5 (commencing with Section 8510) to Division 5 of the Water Code, relating to flood control.
Title
Flood control: Yolo Bypass Cache Slough Partnership Multibenefit Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB369 Pan Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 369 Pan Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB369 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 369 Pan Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB369 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 275, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2385.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2690.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | June 30 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 612.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 519.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 16. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 8510 | New Code | See Bill Text |