CA SB385 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 425, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 425, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 421, 776, 883, 913.9, 1103, 1202, 1701.1, 1701.3, and 7931 of, to add Sections 381.4, 911.2, and 916.5 to, and to repeal Sections 765.7 and 7937 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: reports: programs: studies: ex parte communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar SB385 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 385 Hueso Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB385 Hueso (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 385 Hueso Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB385 Hueso (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 425, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2905.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3169.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | July 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1271.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 25 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1711 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 381.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 421 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 765.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 776 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 7931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 7937 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 883 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 911.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 913.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 916.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |