CA SB392 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 604, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 604, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25503.6 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Tied-house restrictions: advertising exceptions: City of Inglewood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB392 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 392 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB392 Bradford et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 392 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Santiago (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB392 Bradford et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 604, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2739.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3248.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1022.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 340.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25503.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |