CA SB419 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 279, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 279, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48900 of, and to add Section 48901.1 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil discipline.
Title
Pupil discipline: suspensions: willful defiance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB419 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Assembly - SB 419 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Date (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB419 Skinner (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Assembly - SB 419 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Date (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB419 Skinner (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 279, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2236.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2754.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 10). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 745.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 10). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48901.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |