CA SB423 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 1600) of Division 1 of the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
November 3, 2020, statewide general election.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB423 Umberg et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - SB 423 Umberg Third Reading Urgency By Berman (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB423 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - SB 423 Umberg Third Reading Urgency By Berman (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - Amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB423 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-08-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 4095.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4074.) |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Set for hearing August 4. |
2020-08-03 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4062.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2020-08-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 5058.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 27). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | July 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2020-06-23 | Assembly | June 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 4914.) |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | July 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1150.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 771.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 1600 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |