CA SB434 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 447, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 447, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11831.9 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 4097) to Part 1 of Division 4 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health and care facilities.
Title
Substance abuse and mental health services: advertising and marketing.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 434 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB434 Bates et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB434 Bates et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 447, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2523.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1108.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 589.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 457.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11831.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4097 | New Code | See Bill Text |