CA SB439 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 629.78 and 629.82 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: wiretapping: authorization and disclosure.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB439 Umberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 439 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Smith (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB439 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 439 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Smith (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB439 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 645, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2610.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3041.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 593.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 526.) (April 2). |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 629.78 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 629.82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |