CA SB445 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 547, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 547, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25299.32, 25299.43, 25299.50, 25299.50.2, 25299.50.3, 25299.50.4, 25299.51, 25299.51.2, 25299.57, 25299.58, 25299.59, 25299.70, 25299.78, 25299.81, 25299.94, 25299.101, 25299.104, 25299.105, 25299.106, and 25299.107 of, to add Sections 25292.05, 25299.50.6, 25299.51.3, 25299.51.4, 25299.71, 25299.80, 25299.80.5, 25299.80.6, and 25299.82 to, and to add and repeal Section 25299.50.7 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous substances, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Underground storage tanks: hazardous substances: petroleum: groundwater and surface water contamination.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB445 Hill Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 445 Hill Third Reading Urgency By ACHADJIAN (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB445 Price (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 445 Hill Third Reading Urgency By ACHADJIAN (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB445 Price (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 547, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 4968.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Set for hearing August 28. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4959.) |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4919.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 6491.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6342.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 3534.) . |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2513.) |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 805.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 564.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |