CA SB445 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 289, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 289, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48859 of, and to add Section 48852.7 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction and services.
Title
Pupil instruction and services: homeless children: foster children.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #7 SB445 Liu (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SB 445 Liu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB445 Liu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Assembly - SB 445 Liu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB445 Liu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 289, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2205.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2534.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | June 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1031.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4). |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 522.) (April 8). |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48852.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 48859 | Amended Code | Citation Text |