CA SB480 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 35160.3 of the Education Code, relating to school districts.
Title
School districts: pilot programs: Korean Meister high school system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB480 Portantino (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 3050.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3011.) (January 18). |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 935.) (April 26). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35160.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |