CA SB49 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1150, 1151, 1152, 1153, 1155, and 1157 of, to add Section 1154 to, and to repeal Section 1160 of, the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.
Title
Corporate conversions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB49 Umberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 49 Umberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB49 Umberg et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 49 Umberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB49 Umberg et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 237, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4851.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5826.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2801.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Hertzberg. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Umberg. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1180.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1044.) (May 6). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 573.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | March 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 8. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referral to Com. on G.O. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., GOV. & F., and G.O. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 1150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1154 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 1155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1157 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1160 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |