CA SB53 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16520, 25105, 25135, 25205, and 29805 of, and to add Section 25145 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: storage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB53 Portantino (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3049.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3010.) (January 18). |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 2958.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 25145 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 25205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |