CA SB536 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-07 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-07 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7599.56 to the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 1633.3 and 1689.5 of the Civil Code, relating to alarm companies.
Title
Alarm companies: electronic transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB536 Berryhill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2014-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1153.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 881.) (May 8). |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7599.56 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1633.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1689.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53757 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 815 | Amended Code | Citation Text |