CA SB542 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 6377.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exemption: medium- or heavy-duty zero-emission trucks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB542 Limón et al (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB542 Limón et al (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | June 6 hearing: Heard for testimony only. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2775.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Limón. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Limón. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1195.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1045.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 780.) (April 13). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and GOV. & F. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6377.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |