CA SB551 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3206.3 and 3258 of, and to add Section 3205.7 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: wells and facilities: abandonment and decommissioning: reporting and inspections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB551 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 551 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Muratsuchi (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB551 Jackson (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 551 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Muratsuchi (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB551 Jackson (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2903.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 17. Page 3339.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 8). |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | July 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | June 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1353.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1102.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 778.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | April 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3205.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3206.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3258 | Amended Code | Citation Text |