CA SB56 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10513 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
University of California: transfer of real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB56 Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3019.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2969.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Set for hearing January 10. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Read first time. |
2022-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10513 | Amended Code | Citation Text |