CA SB565 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19551.3 of, and to add and repeal Section 19587 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Taxation: filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB565 Caballero et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 565 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB565 Caballero et al (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 565 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB565 Caballero et al (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2023-10-08 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-08 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2845.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3460.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 26). |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 1270.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1175.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 938.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19551.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19587 | New Code | See Bill Text |