CA SB607 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11158.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB607 Portantino (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3020.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 2950.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 8. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 3 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11158.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |