CA SB616 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 37222.19 to the Education Code, relating to public schools.
Title
Public schools: Asian Lunar New Year's Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB616 Huff (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB616 Huff (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | June 22 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | June 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2914.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2894.) (January 13). |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Set for hearing January 13. |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-01-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 37222.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |