CA SB629 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 409.7 to the Penal Code, relating to public safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public peace: media access.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB629 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 629 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Kamlager (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB629 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 2.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 7.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 18).
2020-08-18AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-08-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-07-27AssemblyAugust 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2020-06-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-09SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1002.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1).
2019-04-24SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code409.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback