CA SB636 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 650.5 to the Business and Professions Code, to add Title 23 (commencing with Section 110000) to the Government Code, and to add Sections 11833.1 and 11833.2 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Addiction treatment: advertising: payment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | April 5 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 650.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 110000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11833.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11833.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1371.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB636 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB636 |