CA SB69 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 860, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 860, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21152 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: local agencies: filing of notices of determination or exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB69 Cortese et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Assembly - SB 69 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Boerner (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB69 Cortese et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Assembly - SB 69 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Boerner (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB69 Cortese et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 860, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2465.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2973.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1358.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1159.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 685.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 352.) (March 15). |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2023-01-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |