CA SB691 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 33000.5 and 48260.5 of the Education Code, relating to elementary and secondary education.
Title
State Board of Education: student members: truancy notifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB691 Portantino (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 3051.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3011.) (January 18). |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2969.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Set for hearing January 10. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 570.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33000.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48260.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |