CA SB703 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-29 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-29 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 510 of, and to add Section 511.5 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: work hours: flexible work schedules.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Niello [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-29 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2023-04-26 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 898.) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 511.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |