CA SB757 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-25 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-25 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65352 and 65352.5 of, and to add Section 65350.5 to, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 1120, 10927, and 12924 of, to add Sections 113, 1242.1, and 10750.1 to, and to add Part 2.74 (commencing with Section 10720) to Division 6 of, the Water Code, relating to groundwater.
Title
Groundwater management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB757 Berryhill (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB757 Berryhill (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6346.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel PĂ©rez. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 13). |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1195.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 639.) (April 22). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21608.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21626.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65350.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65352.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10750.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10927 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 1242.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 12924 | Amended Code | Citation Text |