CA SB792 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7109.5 to the Public Contract Code, relating to administrative regulations.
Title
Administrative regulations: corrosion prevention and mitigation projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Assembly - SB 792 Padilla Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB792 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 792 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL Amend By LOWENTHAL Set #1 (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB792 DeSaulnier (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Assembly - SB 792 Padilla Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB792 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 792 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL Amend By LOWENTHAL Set #1 (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB792 DeSaulnier (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5005.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 5015.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 5008.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29). Read second time. Amended. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6750.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 6752.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 6742.) . Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6743.) |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 67. Noes 3. Page 6329.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 6). |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2667.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2645.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 752.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 569.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 66537 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66537.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66537.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66537.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66537.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66537.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66537.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66537.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 7109.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 101.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |