CA SB812 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25178, 25187, 25187.2, 25200, 25360, and 25360.1 of, to add Sections 25200.21, 25200.22, 25205.5, and 25246.1 to, and to add and repeal Article 8.8 (commencing with Section 25199.20) of Chapter 6.5 of Division 20 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Hazardous waste.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB812 De Le (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 812 De Leon Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB812 De Le (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 812 De Leon Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB812 De Le (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 4969.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Set for hearing August 28. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4959.) |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4919.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 6546.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6342.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 17). |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 2666.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2646.) (January 23). |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-01-18 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2615.) (January 15). |
2014-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Set for hearing January 15. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25178 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25187 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25187.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25196.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25199.20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25199.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25200.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25200.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25200.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25200.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25205.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25246.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25360.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |