CA SB837 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 509, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 509, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 25402.13 to the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: building energy standards: sealed and unvented attics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-31 - Assembly - SB 837 Archuleta Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB837 Archuleta (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB837 Archuleta (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 509, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2866.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1079.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 872.) (April 24). |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25402.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |