CA SB839 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1374.6 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.62 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Obesity Treatment Parity Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | January 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Set for hearing January 10. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1374.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.62 | New Code | See Bill Text |