CA SB86 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 299, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 105240) to Part 5 of Division 103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to pesticides.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Pesticide Regulation: chlorpyrifos: quarterly reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB86 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - Assembly - SB 86 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB86 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 299, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30SenateOrdered to unfinished business.
2020-08-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.)
2020-08-30SenateAugust 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-08-30SenateSet for hearing August 30.
2020-08-29SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on EQ. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2020-08-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2020-08-25SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 5200.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 20).
2020-08-11AssemblyAugust 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2020-07-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-27AssemblyJuly 27 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2020-07-08AssemblyJuly 13 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-05-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-07-02AssemblyJuly 2 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-06-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1271.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1089.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 24).
2019-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-03-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code105240New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback