CA SB869 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 662, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 662, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 2.3.1 (commencing with Section 18876) to Division 13 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing: mobilehome parks: recreational vehicle parks: manager training.
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB869 Leyva et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 869 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB869 Leyva et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 869 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB869 Leyva et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 662, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5315.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 3903.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3772.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3218.) (March 24). |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and PUB. S. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 18876 | New Code | See Bill Text |