CA SB877 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 688, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 688, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Chapter 3.131 (commencing with Section 15820.93) of Part 10b of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to correctional facilities, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Correctional facilities: construction.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 3 SB877 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 877 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB877 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 877 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB877 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 688, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4986.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6710.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 26. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5975.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3137.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15820.93 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |