CA SB888 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 508, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 508, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 111222 and 111223 of, to amend the heading of Article 14 (commencing with Section 111222) of Chapter 5 of Part 5 of Division 104 of, and to add Section 114429.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to food safety.
Title
Food safety: Asian rice based noodles.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Eng [D] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D] |
Sen. Gloria Romero [D] | Asm. Van Tran [R] | Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] | Sen. Leland Yee [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB888 Yee (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 888 Yee Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB888 Yee (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 888 Yee Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB888 Yee (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 508, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-19 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4645.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-12 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6177.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.) | |
2010-06-21 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-17 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (Heard in Committee on June 15.) | |
2010-06-03 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-05-24 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-24 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3586.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-18 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-17 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2010-05-07 | Set for hearing May 17. | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3302.) | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-04 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-01-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |