CA SB903 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7513.7 of the Government Code, relating to investments.
Title
Public retirement systems: investments: Iran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB903 Anderson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB903 Anderson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-25 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Coms. on P.E., R. & S.S. and JUD. | |
2011-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1180.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 16). | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 861.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-02 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 809.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 3 in JUD. pending receipt. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD. | |
2011-02-19 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7513.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |