CA SB907 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 233, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 233, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 328.1 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Child abuse or neglect investigation: military notification.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 907 Archuleta Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB907 Archuleta et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB907 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB907 Archuleta et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB907 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 233, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5283.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3816.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3559.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on V.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2020-03-23 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and V.A. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 328.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |