CA SB910 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 638, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 638, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 136.2 of the Penal Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic violence: restraining orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB910 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 910 Pavley Senate Third Reading By WALDRON (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB910 Pavley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 910 Pavley Senate Third Reading By WALDRON (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB910 Pavley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 638, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4686.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6216.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6119.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3323.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3019.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 136.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |