CA SB915 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 44760) to Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to teacher recruitment.
Title
Teacher recruitment: California Center on Teaching
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB915 Liu (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4095.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3999.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3200.) (March 9). |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44760 | New Code | See Bill Text |