CA SB915 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 798.63 to the Civil Code, relating to mobilehomes.
Title
Mobilehome parks: emergency relief: coronavirus (COVID-19).
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 915 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Limón (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - SB 915 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Limón Amend By KILEY Set #2 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB915 Leyva et al (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - SB 915 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Limón Amend By KILEY Set #2 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB915 Leyva et al (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 15. Page 5454.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Amendments by Assembly Member Kiley tabled on motion by Assembly Member Calderon. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 5169.) |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 29). |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | July 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3864.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3767.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3583.) (May 22). |
2020-05-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 798.63 | New Code | See Bill Text |