CA SB940 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66300 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Housing Crisis Act of 2019: City of San Jose.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB940 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 940 Beall Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB940 Beall et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 940 Beall Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB940 Beall et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to unfinished business. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Grove. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5286.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 29). |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | July 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3793.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on HOUSING rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3523.) (May 11). |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2020-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 66300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |