CA SB962 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the public employee pension benefits, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
San Diego Unified Port District: public employee pension benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |