CA SB971 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 125286.1) to Chapter 2 of Part 5 of Division 106 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to genetic disease services.
Title
Bleeding disorders: blood clotting products.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB971 Pavley (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-16 - Assembly - SB 971 Pavley Senate Third Reading By MONNING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB971 Pavley (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-16 - Assembly - SB 971 Pavley Senate Third Reading By MONNING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB971 Pavley (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Business, Professions and Economic Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4878.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-17 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6261.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-12 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |
2010-08-10 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.) | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Heard in committee on June 22.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-06-10 | To Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3732.) To Assembly. | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. (May 28 amended measure version corrected June 2.) | |
2010-05-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-17 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-05-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-05-07 | Set for hearing May 17. | |
2010-05-06 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-05-04 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-05-03 | Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-23 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-21 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3293.) | |
2010-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3210.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Set for hearing April 19. | |
2010-04-07 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-03-12 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2010-02-18 | To Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-02-09 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |