CA SB975 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19138.1 to the Government Code, relating to personal services contracts.
Title
Personal services contracts: legal compliance.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB975 Lieu Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 975 Lieu Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 975 Lieu Senate Third Reading Amend By PAN Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB975 Lieu (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 975 Lieu Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 975 Lieu Senate Third Reading Amend By PAN Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB975 Lieu (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4940.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 6576.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2 and whereby amendments were adopted on August 22. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6460.) . Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6380.) |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 6335.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 18). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 3658.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3706.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3091.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19138.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10343 | New Code | See Bill Text |