CA SB999 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1374.721 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10144.52 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health coverage: mental health and substance use disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | March 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1374.721 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10144.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |