CA SCA12 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 9 of Article IX thereof, relating to the University of California.
Title
University of California: California residents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | May 3 set for first hearing.Testimony taken. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED., JUD., and E. & C.A. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |