CA SCR106 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.
Title
Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SCR 106 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR106 Fuller (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR106 Fuller (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6422.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4048.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Fuller. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |